OR HB2826 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires court to impose mandatory minimum sentence of imprisonment if person is convicted of crime of fleeing or attempting to elude police officer under certain circumstances.
Title
Relating to the crime of fleeing or attempting to elude a police officer.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Olson [R] | Rep. Ronald Noble [R] | Rep. Bill Post [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-02-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2826 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2826/Introduced |