OR HB2825 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Work Session held.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires sentencing court to consider as mitigation evidence defendant was subjected to domestic abuse that was significant factor in criminal behavior. Requires sentencing court to consider as mitigation evidence defendant was subjected to domestic abuse that was significant factor in criminal behavior. Provides that such evidence constitutes substantial and compelling reasons justifying downward departure sentence. Authorizes court to impose lesser sentence even if sentence is mandatory or otherwise required by law. Creates procedure by which person currently serving sentence may petition court for resentencing if person was subjected to abuse that was significant factor in criminal behavior. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to sentencing mitigation; prescribing an effective date; providing for criminal sentence reduction that requires approval by a two-thirds majority.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-23HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback