OR HB2824 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Higher Education Coordinating Commission, in coordination with public universities and community colleges, to conduct study to determine appropriate of return State of Oregon should receive for each patent obtained as result of public moneys provided to public university or community college. Requires Higher Education Coordinating Commission, in coordination with public universities and community colleges, to conduct study to determine appropriate of return State of Oregon should receive for each patent obtained as result of public moneys provided to public university or community college. Requires commission to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to education not later than September 15, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to patents resulting from public funding of post-secondary institutions of education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-02-28HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-16HouseReferred to Higher Education.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback