OR HB2823 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes kidnapping in the first degree and kidnapping in the second degree from definition of "sex crime" that triggers obligation to report as sex offender. Removes kidnapping in the first degree and kidnapping in the second degree from definition of "sex crime" that triggers obligation to report as sex offender. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die. .
Title
Relating to sex crimes; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Karin Power [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-06-10 | House | Informational Meeting scheduled. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2823 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2823/Introduced |