OR HB2822 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Human Services and Oregon Health Authority to ensure that individual receiving mental health services under 1915(i) state plan amendment does not lose any mental health services when individual begins receiving services under 1915(k) state plan amendment. Requires Department of Human Services and Oregon Health Authority to ensure that individual receiving mental health services under 1915(i) state plan amendment does not lose any mental health services when individual begins receiving services under 1915(k) state plan amendment. Requires department to notify individual of right to continued receipt of mental health services. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to mental health services; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-03-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-03-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |