OR HB2818 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expands definition of "consumer contract" to include purchases of used motor vehicles used primarily for personal, family or household purposes. Expands definition of "consumer contract" to include purchases of used motor vehicles used primarily for personal, family or household purposes. Allows consumer to revoke provision of consumer contract that requires consumer to assert claim against other party to contract in forum that is not in this state. Provides that if provision in contract requires arbitration in forum that is not in this state, sole effect of revocation is that proceeding that requires or allows attendance by consumer must be conducted in this state. Provides that party seeking to enforce revoked provision is liable for reasonable attorney fees incurred by consumer. Expands offense of acting as vehicle dealer without certificate to include individuals who act as agents of Department of Transportation without authorization. Establishes civil cause of action for improper sale of vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to motor vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-02-13HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-02-08HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-16HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback