OR HB2818 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 363, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 23, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 363, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 23, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows payment from Wage Security Fund to be made to wage claimant for wages earned and unpaid in event that Commissioner of Bureau of Labor and Industries has obtained judgment in action or has issued final order in administrative proceeding for collection of wage claim. Allows payment from Wage Security Fund to be made to wage claimant for wages earned and unpaid in event that Commissioner of Bureau of Labor and Industries has obtained judgment in action or has issued final order in administrative proceeding for collection of wage claim. Modifies definition of "compensation," for purposes of pay equity requirements, to exclude vaccine incentives, hiring bonuses and retention bonuses. Provides that changes to definition apply only to complaints filed with Commissioner of Bureau of Labor and Industries and claims filed in circuit court on or after specific dates. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to employment; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-14 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 363, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 23, 2021. |
2021-06-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 54; Excused, 5--Clem, Evans, Hayden, Lewis, Valderrama. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Heard, Kennemer, Thatcher. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-03-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Fahey. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 5--Evans, Leif, Rayfield, Reardon, Zika. |
2021-03-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 16, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-09 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |