OR HB2817 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Chapter 418, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifies area of leg to which definition of "podiatry" applies. Clarifies area of leg to which definition of "podiatry" applies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to podiatry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-23 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Behavioral Health and Health Care (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-04HouseChapter 418, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
2023-07-27HouseGovernor signed.
2023-06-27SenatePresident signed.
2023-06-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-06-23HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 53; Excused, 6--Diehl, Elmer, Morgan, Nguyen H, Reschke, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Boshart Davis.
2023-06-21SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
2023-06-21SenateThird reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 24; Absent, 6--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher.
2023-06-20SenateCarried over to 06-21 by unanimous consent.
2023-06-16SenateCarried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent.
2023-06-15SenateSecond reading.
2023-05-12SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2023-05-08SenateWork Session held.
2023-05-01SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-04-17SenateReferred to Health Care.
2023-04-13SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2023-04-13HouseThird reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 49; Nays, 2--Cate, Reschke; Excused, 7--Bynum, Goodwin, Javadi, McIntire, Nathanson, Pham H, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Cramer, Speaker Rayfield.
2023-04-12HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2023 Calendar.
2023-04-11HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2023 Calendar.
2023-04-10HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 11, 2023 Calendar.
2023-04-10HouseSecond reading.
2023-04-06HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2023-04-03HouseWork Session held.
2023-03-15HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-27HouseReferred to Behavioral Health and Health Care by order of Speaker.
2023-01-27HouseWithout recommendation as to passage and be referred to Behavioral Health and Health Care.
2023-01-25HouseWork Session held.
2023-01-12HouseReferred to Climate, Energy, and Environment.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB2817
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2817/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2817/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2817/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2817/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2817/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2817/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23670
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23886
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24082
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24662
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24771
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/66888
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/65770
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/66886
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/73386
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/259082
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/265249
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/265068
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269231
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269232
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269233
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77466
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77520
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77933
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78107
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/270379
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272064
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272162
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272176
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272196
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272772
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273004
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273005
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79125
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79131
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79273
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79472
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34199
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35079
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=573163
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35604
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=588449
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=589450

Bill Comments

feedback