OR HB2817 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Allows student enrolled in program provided by school district or education service district to earn General Educational Development (GED) certificate to participate in interscholastic activities. Allows student enrolled in program provided by school district or education service district to earn General Educational Development (GED) certificate to participate in interscholastic activities. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to students in a program to earn a General Educational Development certificate; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-07SenateSecond reading.
2021-05-07SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2021-04-26SenateWork Session held.
2021-04-19SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-15SenateReferred to Education.
2021-04-12SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-04-10HouseThird reading. Carried by Alonso Leon. Passed. Ayes, 46; Excused, 14--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Bynum, Clem, Grayber, Hayden, Levy, Nearman, Owens, Pham, Reynolds, Wallan, Williams, Zika.
2021-04-09HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-08HouseCarried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-06HouseCarried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-05HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-01HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar.
2021-03-31HouseSecond reading.
2021-03-29HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-03-25HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-11HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Education.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback