OR HB2815 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Corrections to enter into written agreement with nonprofit organization to jointly establish prison-based animal program to provide inmates with opportunity to develop pet care vocational skills. Requires department to adopt rules that are necessary to carry out program. Requires department to submit report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly concerning program, including recommendations for measuring outcomes of program and recommendations for legislation, no later than September 15, 2021. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to department to establish program.
Title
Relating to prison-based animal programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Sen. James Manning [D] | Rep. Diego Hernandez [D] |
Rep. Ronald Noble [R] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2815 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2815/Introduced |