OR HB2814 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Environmental Quality to study approaches to reducing diesel engine emissions attributable to indirect sources of air contamination and submit report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to environment no later than September 15, 2022. Directs Environmental Quality Commission to establish and implement indirect source review program. Directs commission to require indirect sources that create or are likely to create significant air quality concerns to notify affected residents and businesses.] Directs Department of Environmental Quality to study approaches to reducing diesel engine emissions attributable to indirect sources of air contamination and submit report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to environment no later than September 15, 2022. Sunsets January 2, 2023. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to indirect sources of air pollution; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Maxine Dexter [D] | Rep. Khanh Pham [D] | Sen. Wlnsvey Campos [D] | Rep. Ken Helm [D] |
Rep. Tina Kotek [D] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Rachel Prusak [D] |
Rep. Lisa Reynolds [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-04-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |