OR HB2812 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 88, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 88, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expands Housing and Community Services Department's use of Home Ownership Assistance Account to support households with below area median income and to support organizations' homeownership programs with any percentage of home construction or rehabilitation costs.
Title
Relating to the Home Ownership Assistance Account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Chapter 88, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-29 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 53; Excused, 6--Barker, Evans, Findley, Holvey, Nearman, Sprenger; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Girod, Olsen, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Carried over to 04-24 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Carried over to 04-23 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Carried over to 04-22 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Housing. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-03-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Meek. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Clem. |
2019-03-25 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2019-01-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |