OR HB2811 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates refundable child tax credit based upon percentage of federal child tax care credit, as applicable to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2021, and before January 1, 2022. Creates refundable child tax credit based upon percentage of federal child tax care credit, as applicable to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2021, and before January 1, 2022. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2024, and before January 1, 2030. Directs Department of Revenue, in collaboration with Department of Human Services, to make installment payments to personal income taxpayers of estimated amount of majority of child care credit. Applies to tax years beginning on or after next January 1 following receipt of federal approval necessary to exclude installment payments from benefit eligibility determinations, and before January 1, 2030. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to a child tax care credit; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrea Valderrama [D] | Rep. Lisa Reynolds [D] | Rep. Dacia Grayber [D] | Rep. Khanh Pham [D] |
Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Sen. Kayse Jama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Early Childhood and Human Services with subsequent referral to Tax Expenditures. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |