OR HB2807 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Chapter 656, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Chapter 656, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies provisions related to collection of energy resource supplier assessment.
Title
Relating to energy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-25 | House | Chapter 656, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014. |
2013-07-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed. Ayes, 29; nays, 1--Boquist. |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-06-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Bailey. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Unger. |
2013-06-24 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-06-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-05 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-30 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2013-04-23 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-15 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-02-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |