OR HB2804 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits retail pet store from selling or offering to sell dog, cat or rabbit acquired from source other than animal shelter or rescue organization. Imposes record keeping and signage requirements regarding dogs, cats and rabbits sold or offered for sale by retail pet store. Makes prohibited sale or offer to sell violation punishable by maximum of $500 fine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to pets.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-30HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2019-04-08HouseWork Session held.
2019-03-27HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-20HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2019-01-28HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback