OR HB2802 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Chapter 514, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 31, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Chapter 514, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 31, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes pilot program at Portland State University and Eastern Oregon University to enhance hiring of public university students by nonprofit organizations. Establishes pilot program at Portland State University and Eastern Oregon University to enhance hiring of public university students by nonprofit organizations. Requires Portland State University and Eastern Oregon University to submit reports to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to higher education by September 15 of each year. Appropriates moneys for purposes of conducting program. Sunsets program on January 2, 2028. Declares emergency, effective on July 1, 2023.
Title
Relating to post-secondary students working at nonprofit corporations; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Nathan Sosa [D] | Rep. Ricki Ruiz [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Rep. Paul Holvey [D] |
Rep. Zach Hudson [D] | Rep. Bobby Levy [R] | Rep. Khanh Pham [D] | Rep. Lisa Reynolds [D] |
Rep. Gregory Smith [R] | Sen. Bill Hansell [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-15 | House | Chapter 514, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 31, 2023. |
2023-07-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-23 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Knopp. |
2023-06-23 | Senate | Meek, granted unanimous consent to change vote to aye. |
2023-06-23 | Senate | President Wagner, absent, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2023-06-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 4--Anderson, Bonham, Girod, Smith DB; Absent, 6--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Carried over to 06-23 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Carried over to 06-22 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-06-14 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Elmer. |
2023-06-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sosa. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 19--Boice, Boshart Davis, Cate, Conrad, Cramer, Diehl, Elmer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Hieb, Lewis, McIntire, Morgan, Osborne, Reschke, Scharf, Stout, Wallan, Wright; Excused, 1--Hartman; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Breese-Iverson, Speaker Rayfield. |
2023-06-14 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Smith G. |
2023-06-13 | House | Second reading. |
2023-06-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2023-06-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-06-01 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2023-06-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-05-24 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2023-03-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-03-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-02-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Higher Education. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |