OR HB2802 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Homeownership Repair and Rehabilitation Program within Housing and Community Services Department to provide grants to entities providing financial assistance to persons in low income households for repair and rehabilitation of residences. Establishes Homeownership] Home Repair and Rehabilitation Program] Fund to support program. Requires 50 percent of fund to be administered by community action agency network. Establishes Healthy Homes Program within department to research housing health hazards and to provide revolving funds for organizations addressing housing health hazards. Establishes Healthy Homes Revolving] Fund to support program. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to department for deposit into both funds. Makes programs operative January 1, 2020. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to supporting homeownership for low income individuals; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] | Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] |
Rep. Gary Leif [R] | Rep. Ronald Noble [R] | Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] | Sen. Bill Hansell [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |