OR HB2799 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires carrier to offer, in at least 25 percent of carrier's health benefit plans at each coverage level, flat dollar copayments that meet specified criteria for prescription drug coverage. Requires carriers to report annually to Department of Consumer and Business Services specified information about changes to formulary, cost sharing and utilization controls for prescription drugs.
Title
Relating to health benefit plan coverage of prescription drugs.
Sponsors
Rep. Sheri Malstrom Schouten [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Rachel Prusak [D] |
Rep. Barbara Warner [D] | Sen. Brian Boquist [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-02-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-24 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2799 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2799/Introduced |