OR HB2797 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires sentence of 58 to 130 months' imprisonment if person convicted of unlawful delivery or manufacture of controlled substance that results in death of another person from use of controlled substance. Punishes by maximum of 20 years' imprisonment, $375,000 fine, or both. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to homicide resulting from controlled substance offense; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-24 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2797 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2797/Introduced |