OR HB2794 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Land Use and Wildfire Policy Advisory Committee. Creates Land Use and Wildfire Policy Advisory Committee. Sunsets advisory committee July 1, 2022. Requires State Forestry Department, Oregon State University and Department of Land Conservation and Development to conduct study of regional wildfire risk within state. Requires departments and advisory committee to report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than February 1, 2022, regarding possible means for implementing final recommendations produced by Governor's Council on Wildfire Response. Requires inclusion of regional wildfire risk information in report. Authorizes assignment of council to assist state and local agencies and officials regarding implementation of wildfire risk reduction programs. Requires council to report to Legislative Assembly no later than October 31, 2021, with detailed recommendations regarding sustainable financing model for funding comprehensive wildfire strategy. Requires State Department of Energy to commission study of feasibility of using materials from wildfire fuel reduction projects for renewable energy generation. Requires appointment of advisory committee to assist with study. Requires study to be completed by January 15, 2022. Appropriates moneys to Department of Land Conservation and Development, State Forestry Department, Oregon State University and State Department of Energy for 2021-2023 biennium to carry out Act. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to wildfires; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. David Smith [R] | Rep. Gary Leif [R] | Rep. Rick Lewis [R] | Rep. Joseph Zika [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2794 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2794/Introduced |