OR HB2786 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Department of Agriculture to study barriers to family-scale meat production and ways to promote family-scale meat production, and recommend legislative or regulatory avenues to remove identified barriers and promote family-scale meat production. Directs State Department of Agriculture to study barriers to family-scale meat production and ways to promote family-scale meat production, and recommend legislative or regulatory avenues to remove identified barriers and promote family-scale meat production. Directs department to submit report concerning study and recommendations to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022. Directs department to study barriers for family-scale meat producers pertaining to slaughter waste disposal systems, composting of slaughter waste and disposal of dead livestock, and make certain recommendations. Directs department to submit report concerning study and recommendations to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022. Appropriates moneys to department, out of General Fund, for purposes of conducting study] studies and developing recommendations related to family-scale meat production]. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to meat; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |