OR HB2786 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that deputy district attorneys qualify as police officers under Public Employees Retirement System. Provides that district attorneys and] deputy district attorneys qualify as police officers under Public Employees Retirement System.
Title
Relating to the status of district attorneys in the Public Employees Retirement System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-01-24 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |