OR HB2782 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes issuance of bonds under Articles XI-G and XI-Q of Oregon Constitution to finance expansion of Oregon State University-Cascades campus. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to financing of expansion of Oregon State University-Cascades campus; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Rayfield [D] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] | Rep. Knute Buehler [R] |
Rep. Gene Whisnant [R] | Rep. Margaret Doherty [D] | Rep. John Huffman [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-03-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-03-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-02-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |