OR HB2780 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that escrow agent or other person that engages in real estate closing escrow may not accept funds, property or documents if principal to real estate closing escrow is 65 years of age or older and selling price of property is more than 20 percent below appraised or assessed value and if escrow agent or other person reasonably believes that principal does not understand nature or terms of transaction. Requires escrow agent or other person that reasonably believes that principal does not understand nature or terms of transaction to report attempted sale as suspected financial exploitation in accordance with elder abuse reporting requirements. Becomes operative January 1, 2016. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to requirements for real estate closing escrows; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-02-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Effectiveness. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB2780 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2780/Introduced |