OR HB2777 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 123, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 123, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Marine Board to provide optional licensing of boats as charter boats if boat carries fewer than seven passengers for hire. Directs State Marine Board to provide optional licensing of boats as charter boats if boat carries fewer than seven passengers for hire.
Title
Relating to boats.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 123, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Kennemer. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Heard, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Anderson, Thatcher. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith DB. Passed. Ayes, 41; Excused, 14--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Bynum, Clem, Grayber, Hayden, Levy, Nearman, Owens, Pham, Reynolds, Wallan, Williams, Zika; Excused for Business of the House, 5--Campos, Drazan, Gomberg, Salinas, Weber. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |