OR HB2777 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Chapter 427, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Chapter 427, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes mass transit districts to establish administrative process to adjudicate certain ordinance violations. Authorizes mass transit districts to assess fines for violations or require performance of community service in lieu of fine. Provides that person cited may opt out of administrative process at any time. Requires mass transit districts to track data relating to violations subject to administrative process. Requires mass transit districts to report on data annually to Legislative Assembly.
Title
Relating to administrative processes for mass transit districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | House | Chapter 427, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 50; Nays, 3--Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused, 7--Bentz, Boone, Helm, McLane, Noble, Smith G, Witt. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Monnes Anderson. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-03-29 | House | Third reading. Carried by Greenlick. Passed.Ayes, 54; Nays, 5--Hayden, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Whisnant; Excused, 1--Hernandez. |
2017-03-28 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 29, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-03-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 28, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-03-23 | House | Second reading. |
2017-03-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-03-21 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-02-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |