OR HB2777 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits defendant in action under unlawful trade practices law or unlawful debt collections law to respond to action with affirmative defense in which defendant shows by preponderance of evidence that defendant did not intend violation and that violation resulted from bona fide error notwithstanding defendant's maintenance of procedures reasonably adapted to avoid violation.
Title
Relating to affirmative defenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-03-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-02-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |