OR HB2772 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes product stewardship program for household hazardous waste. Establishes Household Hazardous Waste Stewardship Fund. Becomes operative January 1, 2020. Requires initial plans for household hazardous waste stewardship programs to be submitted to Department of Environmental Quality no later than April 1, 2021. Requires household hazardous waste stewardship program developed pursuant to approved plan to be implemented no earlier than January 1, 2022. Imposes penalty for violation by retailer of program provisions not to exceed $100 per day for each day of violation. Imposes penalty for violation by manufacturer or stewardship organization of program provisions not to exceed $25,000 per day for each day of violation. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to household hazardous waste; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-31 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-24 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |