OR HB2769 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Environmental Quality to study disposal of electric vehicle batteries. Requires Department of Environmental Quality to study disposal of electric vehicle batteries. Directs department to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to environment not later than September 15, 2024.
Title
Relating to electric vehicle batteries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-24 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 27 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-24 | House | Motion to withdraw from Climate, Energy, and Environment failed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 29--Andersen, Bowman, Chaichi, Dexter, Evans, Fahey, Gamba, Grayber, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Nathanson, Nelson, Neron, Nguyen D, Nguyen H, Nosse, Pham H, Pham K, Sanchez, Sosa, Tran, Valderrama, Walters, Speaker Rayfield; Excused, 4--Bynum, Owens, Reynolds, Wright. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Climate, Energy, and Environment. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |