OR HB2765 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires school district that provides breakfast to make breakfast available after start of school day. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to school breakfasts; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Margaret Doherty [D] | Rep. Brian Clem [D] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Diego Hernandez [D] |
Sen. Mark Meek [D] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] | Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Student Success (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-17 | House | Referred to Student Success by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Student Success. |
2019-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Education. |
2019-01-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |