OR HB2764 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Chapter 521, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Chapter 521, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies circumstances under which attorney fees may be awarded and amount of attorney fees awarded in workers' compensation claims. Requires payment of interest on certain compensable benefits, attorney fees, penalties and costs. Allows attorney fees for representation before Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services under certain circumstances. Requires Workers' Compensation Board to consider contingent nature of practice of workers' compensation law in establishing attorney fees. Instructs Workers' Compensation Board to review schedule of attorney fees for adjustment biennially. Declares emergency, effective on passage.].
Title
Relating to payments made in workers' compensation claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-26 | House | Chapter 521, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016. |
2015-06-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--Barreto, Parrish; Excused, 2--Barker, Esquivel; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Olson. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Baertschiger Jr, granted unanimous consent to change vote to nay. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Rosenbaum. Passed.Ayes, 18; nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters; excused, 1--Girod. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-05-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Fagan. Passed.Ayes, 32; Nays, 27--Barker, Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Clem, Davis, Esquivel, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McKeown, McLane, Nearman, Olson, Parrish, Post, Smith, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 1--Sprenger. |
2015-05-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 5, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-04-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 4, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-04-29 | House | Second reading. |
2015-04-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-04-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |