OR HB2763 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 744, (2013 Laws): Effective date October 7, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 744, (2013 Laws): Effective date October 7, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows taxpayer to carry over tax credit allowed for qualified equity investment up to fifth succeeding tax year.
Title
Relating to economic development; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-14 | House | Chapter 744, (2013 Laws): Effective date October 7, 2013. |
2013-08-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-28 | House | Rules suspended. House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 58; Excused for Business of the House, 2--McLane, Speaker Kotek. |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Thomsen. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng. bill. (Printed C-Eng.) |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue by order of the President. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-04-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Read. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--McKeown. |
2013-04-09 | House | Second reading. |
2013-04-08 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2013-04-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2013-04-03 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-02-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |