OR HB2761 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Chapter 416, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expands Housing and Community Services Department ability to allow financing of certain affordable residential units within certain housing developments subject to limits established by Oregon Housing Stability Council. Expands Housing and Community Services Department ability to allow financing of certain affordable residential units within mixed-income or mixed-use] certain housing developments subject to limits established by Oregon Housing Stability Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to financing of affordable housing by Housing and Community Services Department.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-05 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-04HouseChapter 416, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
2023-07-27HouseGovernor signed.
2023-06-29SenatePresident signed.
2023-06-29HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-06-24SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
2023-06-24SenateKnopp declared potential conflict of interest.
2023-06-24SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 5--Bonham, Girod, Robinson, Smith DB, Weber; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Thatcher.
2023-06-24SenateSecond reading.
2023-06-24SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2023-06-24SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2023-06-23SenateReferred to Rules.
2023-06-15SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2023-05-16HouseThird reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 45; Nays, 12--Boice, Boshart Davis, Goodwin, Levy B, McIntire, Morgan, Osborne, Owens, Reschke, Scharf, Stout, Wallan; Excused, 2--Breese-Iverson, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Rayfield.
2023-05-15HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-11HouseSecond reading.
2023-05-09HouseWithout recommendation.
2023-05-05HouseWork Session held.
2023-03-30HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2023-03-30HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2023-03-28HouseWork Session held.
2023-03-07HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-16HouseReferred to Housing and Homelessness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB2761
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2761/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2761/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2761/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2761/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/22778
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23272
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76705
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77091
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/65715
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76925
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76956
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/263713
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/263363
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/263040
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267728
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267021
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267311
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272516
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79041
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/81008
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276491
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276492
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276501
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276568
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34835
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35566
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=579806
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/36356
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=590219

Bill Comments

feedback