OR HB2757 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-24 - Chapter 251, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expands and provides funding for coordinated crisis services system including 9-8-8 suicide prevention and behavioral health crisis hotline. Expands and provides funding for coordinated crisis services system including 9-8-8 suicide prevention and behavioral health crisis hotline. Establishes 9-8-8 Trust Fund. Imposes 9-8-8 tax on consumers and retail subscribers who have telecommunications service or interconnected Voice over Internet Protocol service and who have prepaid telecommunications services, to pay for crisis services system. Exempts from taxation telecommunications services provided, based on need, under plan of assistance. Applies to subscriber bills issued and retail transactions made on or after January 1, 2024, and before January 1, 2030. Requires city to enter into memorandum of understanding with county regarding provision of mobile crisis intervention services. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to crisis services; prescribing an effective date; and providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-24HouseChapter 251, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023.
2023-07-13HouseGovernor signed.
2023-06-29SenatePresident signed.
2023-06-29HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-06-25SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
2023-06-25SenateThird reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 6--Anderson, Bonham, Findley, Girod, Robinson, Smith DB; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Thatcher.
2023-06-24SenateSecond reading.
2023-06-24SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2023-06-23SenateWork Session held.
2023-06-23SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-06-22SenateReferred to Finance and Revenue.
2023-06-22SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2023-06-22HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Scharf.
2023-06-22HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 17--Boice, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Conrad, Cramer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Hieb, Javadi, Levy B, Lewis, McIntire, Osborne, Owens, Scharf, Stout, Wallan; Excused, 7--Boshart Davis, Diehl, Elmer, Morgan, Nguyen H, Reschke, Wright.
2023-06-22HouseSecond reading.
2023-06-22HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2023-06-20HouseWork Session held.
2023-04-27HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-03-17HouseReferred to Revenue by prior reference.
2023-03-17HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference.
2023-03-13HouseWork Session held.
2023-02-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-16HouseReferred to Behavioral Health and Health Care with subsequent referral to Revenue.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB2757
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2757/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2757/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2757/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2757/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2757/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2757/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/22954
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24630
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25424
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25460
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25485
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25486
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75557
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75968
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/65711
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75552
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75714
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/260569
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/260159
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264759
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264720
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264721
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/270322
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271784
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271935
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276174
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276176
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80780
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276281
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276282
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276283
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276284
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80786
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80876
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80984
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276460
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276461
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276471
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/81002
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276473
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276474
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276475
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276518
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34543
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/36259
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=589076
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/36352
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=590609

Bill Comments

feedback