OR HB2757 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires bidder for public improvement contract to demonstrate to contracting agency as part of responsibility determination that bidder provides health benefit plan or health insurance and retirement benefit plan to bidder's employees, if public improvement contract or subcontract related to public improvement contract has contract price that exceeds $200,000. Requires bidder for public improvement contract to demonstrate to contracting agency as part of responsibility determination that bidder provides health benefit plan or health insurance and retirement benefit plan to bidder's employees, if public improvement contract or subcontract related to public improvement contract has contract price that exceeds $200,000. Becomes operative January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to requirements in contracting agencies' responsibility determinations for public improvement contracts; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Holvey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-17 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2757 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2757/Introduced |