OR HB2755 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes advisory committee for purpose of assisting Department of Education in distributing moneys in Blind and Visually Impaired Student Fund.
Title
Relating to the Blind and Visually Impaired Student Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-03-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-02-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |