OR HB2752 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Business Development Department to develop and administer program to issue grants to fund projects for construction of all-wood high-rise buildings in this state. Requires department to prioritize projects that result in greatest increase of affordable housing and best demonstrate feasibility and innovative nature of building high-rise structure out of wood. Allocates moneys from Administrative Services Economic Development Fund to department for grant program.
Title
Relating to economic development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2017-03-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-03-20 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Trade. |
2017-02-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |