OR HB2752 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases maximum amount of corporate excise tax credit allowed for qualified research activities. Provides for refundability of credit. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2016. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax credits for qualified research facilities; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Tobias Read [D] | Rep. Val Hoyle [D] | Rep. John Davis [R] | Rep. Knute Buehler [R] |
Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-12 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 25 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-06-12 | House | Motion to withdraw from Revenue failed.Ayes, 25; Nays, 31--Barker, Barnhart, Barton, Boone, Buckley, Clem, Doherty, Fagan, Frederick, Gallegos, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Holvey, Hoyle, Keny-Guyer, Komp, Lininger, Lively, McKeown, Nathanson, Nosse, Rayfield, Reardon, Smith Warner, Taylor, Vega Pederson, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek; Absent, 1--Olson; Excused, 3--Barreto, Esquivel, Johnson. |
2015-04-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2015-02-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2015-02-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-02-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Higher Education, Innovation, and Workforce Development with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |