OR HB2748 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 122, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 122, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies sources of moneys deposited in Residential Solid Fuel Heating Air Quality Improvement Fund. Allows moneys in fund to be used for funding programs for replacing or removing solid fuel burning devices that are not certified by Department of Environmental Quality. Adds rebates to permissible types of subsidies available under solid fuel burning device replacement or removal program. Requires Department of Environmental Quality to establish program for providing grants, loans, rebates or other subsidies to make dry wood or cleaner fuel available to communities or individuals. Requires Department of Environmental Quality to prioritize allocation of grants, loans, rebates or other subsidies under solid fuel burning device replacement or removal program and dry wood or cleaner fuel provision program to be used in nonattainment areas for particulate matter or areas at substantial risk of being designated nonattainment areas for particulate matter. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to the Residential Solid Fuel Heating Air Quality Improvement Fund; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 122, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2017. |
2017-05-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 53; Excused, 7--Boone, Esquivel, Fahey, Johnson, McKeown, Reardon, Sollman. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed.Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Barnhart, Holvey, Lively, Nathanson; Excused, 2--Boone, Lewis. |
2017-04-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-10 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-07 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2017-04-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2017-04-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-02-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |