OR HB2746 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires State Department of Fish and Wildlife to biennially report to Legislative Assembly regarding estimated change in wolf population. Requires Legislative Assembly to identify amount of state funding necessary to provide counties with assistance sufficient for carrying out essential features of county programs regarding wolf depredation and financial assistance. Requires Legislative Assembly to review estimate of change in wolf population prior to making appropriation to fund used for wolf depredation and financial assistance grant program. Requires that Legislative Assembly establish, to extent practicable, fund appropriation amount greater than identified necessary funding amount and reflecting estimated change in wolf population. Requires that Legislative Assembly, to extent practicable, direct that minimum percentage of appropriation be expended for financial assistance to persons who implement livestock management techniques or nonlethal wolf deterrence techniques designed to discourage wolf depredation of livestock.
Title
Relating to wolves.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-02-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2746 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2746/Introduced |