OR HB2746 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Chapter 8, (2017 Laws): Effective date March 28, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Chapter 8, (2017 Laws): Effective date March 28, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires payment of refund value of 10 cents for certain beverage containers on and after April 1, 2017, regardless of refund value indicated on beverage container. Allows sale of beverage containers that do not indicate proper refund value on and after April 1, 2017, and until September 30, 2018. Requires payment of refund value of 10 cents for certain beverage containers on and after January 1, 2018, regardless of refund value indicated on beverage container. Allows sale of beverage containers that do not indicate refund value on and after January 1, 2018, and until December 31, 2018. Sunsets January 2, 2019. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to facilitating the transition to a not less than 10 cent refund value of certain beverage containers beginning in 2017; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Lininger [D] | Rep. Brian Clem [D] | Rep. Paul Holvey [D] | Rep. Mark Johnson [R] |
Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] | Sen. Alan Olsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Chapter 8, (2017 Laws): Effective date March 28, 2017. |
2017-03-28 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-03-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 23; nays, 4--Boquist, Johnson, Kruse, Winters; excused, 3--DeBoer, Frederick, Thatcher. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Carried over to 03-20 by unanimous consent. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-02-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lininger. Passed.Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--Nearman, Sprenger; Excused, 2--Alonso Leon, Boone. |
2017-02-20 | House | Second reading. |
2017-02-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-02-15 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2017-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |