OR HB2742 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Education to distribute grants for purpose of developing and diversifying education workforce for prekindergarten through grade 12. Establishes Next Generation Educator Recruitment and Development Account. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to account. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to the education workforce; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Sen. Rob Wagner [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] |
Rep. Margaret Doherty [D] | Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] | Rep. Cheri Helt [R] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Student Success by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Student Success by prior reference. |
2019-03-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Student Success by prior reference. |
2019-03-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Student Success. |
2019-01-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |