OR HB2740 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter 395, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter 395, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increases age of trafficked person from 15 to 18 for crime of trafficking in persons for use in commercial sex act.
Title
Relating to trafficking in persons.
Sponsors
Rep. John Huffman [R] | Sen. Kathleen Taylor [D] | Rep. Duane Stark [R] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] |
Rep. Bill Post [R] | Rep. Bill Post [R] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] |
Sen. Kim Thatcher [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | House | Chapter 395, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Gelser. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-05-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Huffman. Passed.Ayes, 60. |
2017-05-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 4, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 3, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 2, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-27 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |