OR HB2738 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Human Services to study the feasibility of establishing guaranteed income program in this state. Requires Department of Human Services to study the feasibility of establishing guaranteed income program in this state. Directs department to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to human services not later than September 15, 2024. Sunsets January 2, 2025.
Title
Relating to antipoverty programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Early Childhood and Human Services. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |