OR HB2738 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
Pending: Joint Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies CASA Volunteer Programs to direct Oregon Department of Administrative Services to contract with nongovernmental entity to serve as statewide coordinating entity for provision of court appointed special advocate services. Modifies CASA Volunteer Programs to direct Oregon Department of Administrative Services to contract with nongovernmental entity to serve as statewide coordinating entity for provision of court appointed special advocate services. Appropriates moneys to Court Appointed Special Advocate Fund for CASA Volunteer Program and for distribution to Oregon CASA Network for court appointed special advocate training programs. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to court appointed special advocates; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-04-16HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-04-12HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-07HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-05HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-08HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Human Services with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback