OR HB2735 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Disaster Response and Recovery. Establishes Open Spaces Task Force on Emergency Preparedness] Task Force on Disaster Response and Recovery. Directs task force, inter alia, to identify locations suitable for emergency preparedness, response and recovery needs, identify projects to prepare Redmond Municipal Airport and Oregon International Port of Coos Bay for use in emergency, and identify other projects to increase emergency resilience of this state. Requires report to Legislative Assembly by September 15, 2020. Sunsets on December 31, 2020. Declares emergency, effective on passage.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to emergency resilience; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |