OR HB2734 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Human Services to operate statewide guaranteed income pilot project, study results of project and report findings with possible legislation to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to human services. Requires Department of Human Services to operate statewide guaranteed income pilot project, study results of project and report findings with possible legislation to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to human services. Sunsets January 2, 2025.
Title
Relating to antipoverty programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Early Childhood and Human Services with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |