OR HB2730 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Chapter 806, (2015 Laws): Effective date August 12, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Transportation to establish Portland Trail Blazers license plate program for issuance of special registration plate. Imposes surcharge per year of registration. Directs that moneys from surcharge on registration plate be transferred to Trail Blazers Foundation established by Portland Trail Blazers. Directs department to establish breast cancer awareness registration plate program for issuance of special registration plate. Imposes surcharge per year of registration and directs department to transfer net proceeds from surcharge to Oregon Health Authority Fund. Establishes special registration plate program within department. Repeals limitation on number of special registration plates department may issue at one time. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to transportation; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-07-06 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-07-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill to resolve conflicts. (Printed C-Eng) (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-17HouseChapter 806, (2015 Laws): Effective date August 12, 2015.
2015-08-12HouseGovernor signed.
2015-07-13SenatePresident signed.
2015-07-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-07-06HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 55; Nays, 4--Barnhart, Gomberg, Holvey, Johnson; Excused, 1--Buehler.
2015-07-03SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 20; nays, 3--Boquist, Edwards, Gelser; excused, 7--Beyer, Devlin, Girod, Johnson, Olsen, Shields, President Courtney.
2015-07-03SenateSecond reading.
2015-07-03SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng. bill to resolve conflicts. (Printed C-Eng.)
2015-07-03SenateWork Session held.
2015-07-01SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2015-07-01SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2015-06-30HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Barton, Kennemer. Passed.Ayes, 52; Nays, 5--Gomberg, Holvey, Johnson, Lively, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Greenlick; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
2015-06-30HouseSecond reading.
2015-06-30HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2015-06-29HouseWork Session held.
2015-06-24HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2015-06-24HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2015-06-17HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
2015-05-28HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2015-05-28HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2015-05-20HouseWork Session held.
2015-05-18HouseWork Session held.
2015-04-24HouseReferred to Rules by order of Speaker.
2015-04-24HouseWithout recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules.
2015-04-20HouseWork Session held.
2015-01-16HouseReferred to Transportation and Economic Development.
2015-01-12HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB2730
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2730/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2730/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2730/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2730/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2730/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2730/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2730/C-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2730/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/21869
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/22583
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23279
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=363405
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23441
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=364687
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=364915

Bill Comments

feedback