OR HB2729 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Oregon Watershed Enhancement Board for purposes related to programs for grants from Oregon Agricultural Heritage Fund. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to programs for grants from Oregon Agricultural Heritage Fund; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Witt [D] | Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Sen. Daniel Bonham [R] |
Rep. Brian Clem [D] | Sen. Lynn Findley [R] | Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Rep. Rick Lewis [R] |
Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Rep. Susan McLain [D] | Rep. Bill Post [R] | Rep. Rachel Prusak [D] |
Rep. Andrea Salinas [D] | Sen. David Smith [R] | Rep. Gregory Smith [R] | Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] |
Rep. Anna Williams [D] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Sen. Chuck Thomsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Land Use with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |