OR HB2729 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 743, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 743, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Education for purpose of United States Department of Agriculture's Afterschool Meal and Snack Program.
Title
Relating to the United States Department of Agriculture's Afterschool Meal and Snack Program; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-14 | House | Chapter 743, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013. |
2013-08-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 28; nays, 1--Kruse; excused, 1--Devlin. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-06-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Komp. Passed. Ayes, 45; Nays, 13--Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Kennemer, Krieger, Olson, Thatcher, Weidner; Excused, 2--Barker, Smith. |
2013-06-26 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-06-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-18 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-17 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2013-03-26 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-03-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-03-25 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-02-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |